US SB572 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Additional Supplemental Appropriations for Disaster Relief, 2019 This bill provides FY2019 supplemental appropriations to several federal departments and agencies for expenses related to the consequences of recent wildfires, hurricanes, volcanos, earthquakes, typhoons, and other natural disasters. The funding provided by this bill is designated as emergency spending, which is exempt from discretionary spending limits and other budget enforcement rules. The bill includes appropriations for the Department of Agriculture, the Department of Commerce, the Department of Justice, the Department of Defense, the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, the Department of the Interior, the U.S. Coast Guard, the Environmental Protection Agency, the Forest Service, the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of Labor, the Department of Education, the Government Accountability Office, the Department of Veterans Affairs, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of Housing and Urban Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional Supplemental Appropriations for Disaster Relief, 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Same As/Similar To

HB268 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on H.R. 268 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 56) entered in Senate.
HB2157 (Related) 2019-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 116-20. (TXT | PDF)
SB811 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR357 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Appropriations
Army Corps of Engineers
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Child safety and welfare
Coast guard
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Defense spending
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Education
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of Justice
Department of Labor
Department of the Interior
Department of Transportation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency management
Employment and training programs
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Family services
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Historic sites and heritage areas
Housing and community development funding
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Legal Services Corporation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Medical research
Mental health
Military facilities and property
Mississippi River
National Guard and reserves
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Research administration and funding
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
Utah
Veterans' medical care
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Watersheds

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback