US SB549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Voter Empowerment Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Empowerment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1275 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1451 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB93 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB650 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB734 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1438 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1460 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1504 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1513 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1535 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1546 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1573 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB624 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Administrative remedies
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Commemorative events and holidays
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Commerce
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employee leave
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Higher education
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Northern Mariana Islands
Political advertising
Postal service
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Voting rights

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback