US SB548 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-28 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-28 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to convey land in Anchorage, Alaska, to the Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium, and for other purposes.
Title
Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-05-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3490; text: CR S3490) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 41. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-13. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB443 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 490.
HB441 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-266.
HB441 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-266.