US SB547 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CLEAR Act Connecting Lobbyists and Electeds for Accountability and Reform Act Connecting Lobbyists and Electeds for Accountability and Reform Act or the CLEAR Act This bill requires reports filed by political committees, reports filed by persons making independent expenditures, and reports filed by persons making disbursements for electioneering communications to disclose if individuals identified in the reports are registered lobbyists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLEAR Act Connecting Lobbyists and Electeds for Accountability and Reform Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB842 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback