US SB536 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cybersecurity Disclosure Act of 2017 This bill directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to issue final rules requiring a registered issuer to: disclose in its mandatory annual report or annual proxy statement whether any member of its governing body has expertise or experience in cybersecurity, including details necessary to describe fully the nature of that expertise or experience; and if no member has such expertise or experience, describe what other company cybersecurity steps were taken into account by the persons responsible for identifying and evaluating nominees for the governing body. The SEC shall, in coordination with the National Institute of Standards and Technology, define what constitutes expertise or experience in cybersecurity.
Title
Cybersecurity Disclosure Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-95. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1641-1642) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6638 (Related) 2018-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computer security and identity theft
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Computer security and identity theft
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/536/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s536/BILLS-115s536is.pdf |