US SB529 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

National Landslide Preparedness Act This bill directs the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS) to establish a National Landslide Hazards Reduction Program to identify and understand landslide hazards and risks, reduce losses from landslides, protect communities at risk of landslide hazards, and help improve communication and emergency preparedness. The USGS shall, among other things develop and publish a national strategy for landslide hazards, risk reduction, and response in the United States (including territories); develop and maintain a publicly accessible national landslide hazard and risk inventory database; expand the early warning system for debris flow; and establish emergency response procedures for the rapid deployment of federal scientists, equipment, and services to areas impacted by a significant landslide event. The USGS may provide grants to research, map, assess, and collect data on landslide hazards. The National Science Foundation may provide grants to eligible entities for landslide research. The USGS (1) shall establish the 3D Elevation Program and the 3D Elevation Federal Interagency Coordinating Committee, and (2) may make grants and enter into cooperative agreements to facilitate the improvement of nationwide coverage of 3D elevation data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Landslide Preparedness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-07HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-08-07HouseReceived in the House.
2020-08-04SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-07-30SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2020-07-30SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4644-4647)
2020-07-30SenateS.Amdt.2500 Amendment SA 2500 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-07-30SenateS.Amdt.2500 Amendment SA 2500 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Cantwell. (consideration: CR S4647; text: CR S4647) To improve the authorizations of appropriations.
2020-07-30SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4644-4647)
2019-12-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 315.
2019-12-05SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-165.
2019-04-03SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-02-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1261 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback