US SB527 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the Foot Soldiers who participated in Bloody Sunday, Turnaround Tuesday, or in the final Selma to Montgomery Voting Rights March in March of 1965, which served as a catalyst for the Voting Rights Act of 1965. (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Speaker of the House and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal to the Foot Soldiers who participated in Bloody Sunday, Turnaround Tuesday, or the final Selma to Montgomery Voting Rights March during March of 1965, which served as a catalyst for the Voting Rights Act of 1965. (Sec. 4) The medals struck pursuant to this Act are national medals.
Title
A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the Foot Soldiers who participated in Bloody Sunday, Turnaround Tuesday, or in the final Selma to Montgomery Voting Rights March in March of 1965, which served as a catalyst for the Voting Rights Act of 1965.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-02-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1137-1138; text as passed Senate: CR S1137) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 24. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Shelby without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB431 (Related) 2015-03-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-5. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Alabama
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional tributes
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Voting rights
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional tributes
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Voting rights