US SB525 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2780-2781)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2780-2781)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmaceutical Market Access and Drug Safety Act of 2009 - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (FFDCA) to revise provisions governing the importation of prescription drugs. Waives the limitation on importation of prescription drugs that have been exported from the United States. Prohibits the importation of a qualifying drug unless such drug is imported by: (1) a registered importer; or (2) an individual for personal use. Establishes registration conditions for importers and exporters. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to inspect places of business, verify chains of custody, inspect facilities, and determine compliance with registration conditions. Sets forth provisions governing the importation of qualifying drugs that are different from U.S. label drugs, including standards for judging such differences. Prohibits manufacturers from: (1) discriminating against registered exporters or importers; (2) causing there to be a difference in a prescription drug distributed in the United States and one distributed in a permitted country; (3) engaging in actions to restrict, prohibit, or delay the importation of a qualifying drug; or (4) engaging in any action that the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) determines discriminates against a person that engages or attempts to engage in the importation of a qualifying drug. States that the resale in the United States of prescription drugs that were properly sold abroad is not patent infringement. Requires the Secretary to educate consumers regarding prescription drug importation. Sets forth provisions governing the sale of prescription drugs through an Internet site. Includes the dispensing or selling of a prescription drug in violation of this Act as a prohibited act under FFDCA. Prohibits the introduction of restricted transactions with unregistered foreign pharmacies into a payment system or the completion of such transactions using a payment system.
Title
Pharmaceutical Market Access and Drug Safety Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kent Conrad [D-ND] | Sen. Byron Dorgan [D-ND] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Russell Feingold [D-WI] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Daniel Inouye [D-HI] |
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Edward Kennedy [D-MA] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Blanche Lincoln [D-AR] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Arlen Specter [D-PA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-05 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2780-2781) | |
2009-03-04 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1298 (Same As) 2009-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1232 (Same As) 2009-06-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 73.
SB3415 (Related) 2010-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1232 (Same As) 2009-06-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 73.
SB3415 (Related) 2010-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Asia
Australia
Business records
Canada
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Contracts and agency
Department of Health and Human Services
Europe
European Union
Evidence and witnesses
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government investigations
Health information and medical records
Intellectual property
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Japan
Marketing and advertising
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
New Zealand
Oceania
Prescription drugs
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades
Switzerland
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/525/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s525/BILLS-111s525is.pdf |