US SB524 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish the Advisory Committee on Tribal and Indian Affairs to advise the VA on matters relating to Native American tribes, tribal organizations, and Native American veterans.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Tribal Advisory Committee Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2791 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal-Indian relations
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal-Indian relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s524/BILLS-116s524is.pdf |