US SB515 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award grants to States and political subdivisions of States to hire, employ, train and dispatch mental health professionals to respond in lieu of law enforcement officers in emergencies involving one or more persons with a mental illness or an intellectual or developmental disability, and for other purposes.
Title
Mental Health Justice Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1368 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB7254 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB8542 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1377 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7254 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB8542 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1377 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/515/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s515/BILLS-117s515is.pdf |