US SB504 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-35. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-35. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) expands eligibility for membership in The American Legion to include veterans and servicemembers who served any time after December 7, 1941, including those currently serving. Presently, only veterans and servicemembers who served during periods of war specified by Congress are eligible to join The American Legion. (Sec. 4) The bill also prohibits discrimination based on race, color, religion, sex, or national origin for the purposes of holding a staff position at The American Legion.
Title
LEGION Act Let Everyone Get Involved in Opportunities for National Service Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-35. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7220-7221) |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 504. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7220-7222) |
2019-07-23 | House | Mr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3326-3327) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.252 Amendment SA 252 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.252 Amendment SA 252 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Tillis. (consideration: CR S3326; text: CR S3326) To expand eligibility for membership in The American Legion and to prohibit discrimination with respect to staff positions. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3326-3327) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1641 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition