US SB500 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 428.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 428.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(1) establishes the National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund, and (2) requires 50% of all energy development revenues for FY2020-FY2024 to be deposited into such fund. Amounts deposited in the fund must not exceed $1.3 billion for any fiscal year and must be used for meeting the priority deferred maintenance needs of the National Park Service.
Title
Restore Our Parks Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 428. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1225 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199.
SB2783 (Related) 2019-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2783 (Related) 2019-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Charitable contributions
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Disability and paralysis
Energy revenues and royalties
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Historic sites and heritage areas
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Roads and highways
Transportation programs funding
Charitable contributions
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Disability and paralysis
Energy revenues and royalties
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Historic sites and heritage areas
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Roads and highways
Transportation programs funding