US SB499 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2019-02-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB1014 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
HB4294 (Related) 2019-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback