US SB4949 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-355.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-355.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to address green burial sections in national cemeteries, and for other purposes.
Title
National Cemeteries Preservation and Protection Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-355. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10038-10039) |
2022-12-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4949. |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10038-10040) |
2022-12-22 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7303-7304; text: CR S7303-7304) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |