US SB491 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates specified segments of the main stem and the tributaries of the York River in Maine as a recreational river. The Department of the Interior may enter into cooperative agreements to provide for the long-term protection, preservation, and enhancement of the river segments. No land or interest in land within the watersheds of the river segments may be acquired by condemnation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

York River Wild and Scenic River Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200.
2021-12-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-50.
2021-11-18SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-06-23SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2021-03-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB1469 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback