US SB4900 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-183.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-183.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the SBIR and STTR programs and pilot programs, and for other purposes.
Title
SBIR and STTR Extension Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 415 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-183. |
2022-09-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-09-30 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 9 (Roll no. 461). (text: CR H8128-8132) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8269-8270) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4900. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8128-8136) |
2022-09-28 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4872-4876; text: CR S4872-4876) |