US SB4822 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-3)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 346. (CR S4949-4950)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 346. (CR S4949-4950)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to provide for additional disclosure requirements for corporations, labor organizations, Super PACs and other entities, and for other purposes.
Title
Stand By Every Ad Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-22 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 346. (CR S4949-4950) |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S4941) |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S4815-4816) |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S4815-4816) |
2022-09-13 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484. |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB129 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1171 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1334 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB443 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-331.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2671 (Related) 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
HB1279 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB129 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1171 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1334 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB443 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-331.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2671 (Related) 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
HB1279 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.