US SB4809 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to, within 30 days, establish a new tribal priority window for the 2.5 gigahertz band, through which tribes in rural areas may apply for unassigned spectrum. The new window is subject to the same terms and conditions as the tribal priority window that was adopted by the FCC on July 10, 2019, and that closed on September 2, 2020.
Title
Extending Tribal Broadband Priority Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8665 (Same As) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Indian lands and resources rights
Internet and video services
Native Americans
Radio spectrum allocation
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Indian lands and resources rights
Internet and video services
Native Americans
Radio spectrum allocation
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4809/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4809/BILLS-116s4809is.pdf |