US SB4761 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title V of the Social Security Act to establish a grant program for community-based maternal mentoring programs.
Title
Community Mentors for Moms Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8669 (Related) 2022-08-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4761/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4761/BILLS-117s4761is.pdf |