US SB4719 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect children against sexual abuse and exploitation, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing Child Sex Abuse Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7304) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6549 Amendment SA 6549 proposed by Senator Kelly for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S7304; text: CR S7304) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6549 Amendment SA 6549 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7304-7305) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |