US SB460 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the authority for Federal contractors to reimburse employees unable to perform work due to the COVID-19 pandemic from March 31, 2021, to September 30, 2021.
Title
A bill to extend the authority for Federal contractors to reimburse employees unable to perform work due to the COVID-19 pandemic from March 31, 2021, to September 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
HB1668 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB1668 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/460/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s460/BILLS-117s460is.pdf |