US SB4571 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

2020 Census Deadline Extensions Act This bill extends certain deadlines for the U.S. Census Bureau to complete the 2020 decennial census of population. The bill prohibits the bureau from concluding the Nonresponse Followup operation or the Self-Response operation before October 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2020 Census Deadline Extensions Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB7974 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8250 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4048 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback