US SB455 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Failed to report favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Failed to report favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate and expand wilderness areas in Olympic National Forest in the State of Washington, and to designate certain rivers in Olympic National Forest and Olympic National Park as wild and scenic rivers, and for other purposes.
Title
Wild Olympics Wilderness and Wild and Scenic Rivers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Failed to report favorably. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB999 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB999 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/455/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s455/BILLS-117s455is.pdf |