US SB452 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-22-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Became Public Law No: 117-84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-22-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Became Public Law No: 117-84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to Willie O'Ree, in recognition of his extraordinary contributions and commitment to hockey, inclusion, and recreational opportunity.
Title
Willie O’Ree Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 426 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-84. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-01-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-01-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 426 - 0 (Roll no. 11). (text: CR H235) |
2022-01-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 452. |
2022-01-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H235-238) |
2022-01-19 | House | Ms. Dean moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-07-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5111) |
2021-07-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.2122 Amendment SA 2122 proposed by Senator Whitehouse for Senator Stabenow. (consideration: CR S5110-5111; text: CR S5109) In the nature of a substitute. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.2122 Amendment SA 2122 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5110-5111) |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.