US SB4517 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the electoral college time line for the 2020 presidential election. First, the bill requires states to make final determinations of controversies or contests as to the appointment of electors by January 1, 2021. Currently, the deadline is December 8, 2020. Further, the bill requires electors to meet in their respective states on January 2, 2021, to cast their votes for President and Vice President. Currently, electors must meet on December 14, 2020.
Title
A bill to provide States additional time relating to the appointment of electors and for the meeting of electors for the 2020 election for President and Vice President.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
State and local government operations
Government operations and politics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4517/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4517/BILLS-116s4517is.pdf |