US SB4462 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a national integrated flood information system within the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
FLOODS Act Flood Level Observation, Operations, and Decision Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6694-6698; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6694-6698) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 556. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-269. |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8882 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Natural disasters
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Student aid and college costs
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Natural disasters
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Student aid and college costs
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply