US SB443 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-2)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses campaign finance, including by expanding the prohibition on campaign spending by foreign nationals, requiring additional disclosures of campaign expenditures, and requiring additional disclosures regarding certain political advertisements. First, the bill prohibits foreign nationals from participating in the decision-making process regarding an election expenditure. Additionally, the bill expands existing foreign money prohibitions to include disbursements for paid web-based or digital communications and federal judicial nomination communications. It also prohibits foreign nationals from contributing to campaigns related to ballot initiatives and referenda. The Federal Election Commission (FEC) must conduct an audit after each federal election cycle to determine the incidence of illicit foreign money. Next, the bill makes it unlawful to establish or use a corporation, company, or other entity with the intent to conceal an election contribution or donation by a foreign national. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both. Covered organizations (e.g., corporations, labor organizations, and political organizations) must, within 24 hours, file reports with the FEC to disclose campaign expenditures of more than $10,000 during an election cycle. Finally, the bill requires organizations to provide additional disclosures regarding political advertisements, including the donors who contributed the most money to that organization in the last year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISCLOSE Act of 2021 Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB1279 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1171 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1334 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2671 (Related) 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback