US SB440 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-306.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-306.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a procedure for the conveyance of certain Federal property around the Dickinson Reservoir in the State of North Dakota. This bill directs the Commissioner of Reclamation to: (1) provide to the holder of a permit for a cabin site located on federal property around the Dickinson Reservoir in North Dakota the first option to purchase the site for fair market value, provided that the permittee first pay to Dickinson Parks & Recreation (the Department) any outstanding permit fees before exercising such option; and (2) convey to a permittee who exercises such option all U.S. interest in the site, easements for access to the site, a dock for the site, and the improvements on it. The fair market value of a property shall be determined by a local, third-party appraiser, valuing the property as unimproved residential property, excluding all improvements. Beginning two years after enactment of this bill: (1) if a permittee has not exercised such option, the Commissioner shall transfer the site to the Department, without cost; and (2) the Commissioner shall transfer to the Department, without cost, land currently managed by the Department on which no cabin is located. Each such conveyance and transfer shall be made subject to specified mineral rights and rights-of-way of third parties. A permittee may not build any new permanent structure below an elevation of 2,430 feet. If a permittee builds such a structure, the permittee's site shall revert to the Department. Revenues from a sale of federal land pursuant to this bill shall be made available to the Commissioner for: (1) the costs of carrying out this bill, and (2) deferred maintenance activities relating to the operation of the dam in the Dickinson Reservoir.
Title
A bill to establish a procedure for the conveyance of certain Federal property around the Dickinson Reservoir in the State of North Dakota.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-306. |
2018-12-11 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-11-29 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-11-28 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-27 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7141) |
2018-11-14 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2018-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9480-9481) |
2018-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 440. |
2018-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9480-9482) |
2018-11-13 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-10-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-10-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-10-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6549-6550; text: CR S6549-6550) |
2018-08-01 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-313. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 533. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-38. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6038 (Similar To) 2018-08-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 696.
Subjects
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Missouri River
North Dakota
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Water storage
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Missouri River
North Dakota
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Water storage