US SB437 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to concede, for the purposes of health care benefits and wartime disability compensation, that a veteran was exposed to certain toxic substances, chemicals, and hazards from burn pits if such veteran served on active duty in a covered location during a specified time frame (unless there is affirmative evidence to establish that the veteran was not exposed during such service). A burn pit is an area used for burning solid waste in open air without equipment. Specifically, the bill covers the following locations and corresponding time periods: Iraq between August 2, 1990, and February 28, 1991, as well as from March 19, 2003, until burn pits are no longer used in this location; Southwest Asia (including Kuwait, Saudi Arabia, Oman, and Qatar) from August 2, 1990, until burn pits are no longer used in these locations; and Afghanistan, Syria, Jordan, Egypt, Lebanon, Yemen, and Djibouti from September 11, 2001, until burn pits are no longer used in these locations. Under the bill, if an exposed veteran submits insufficient evidence to establish a service-connection for purposes of disability compensation, the VA shall provide a medical examination and request a medical opinion regarding a causal link between the disability and a toxin, chemical, or hazard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Burn Pits Exposure Recognition Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-02-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2436 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback