US SB4361 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 50. Record Vote Number: 182. (CR S3878)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 50. Record Vote Number: 182. (CR S3878)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill making emergency supplemental appropriations for border security and combatting fentanyl for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Title
Border Security and Combatting Fentanyl Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2024 Border Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 4361 RC# 182 (Y: 43 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 50. Record Vote Number: 182. (CR S3878) |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S3862) |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S3819) |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S3783) |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S3783) |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 397. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8496 (Related) 2024-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.