US SB4323 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-2)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes congressional rescue committees to develop recommendations and legislation to improve critical social contract programs. A critical social contract program is a federal program for which a federal trust fund is established (e.g., Social Security, Medicare, and federal highway programs), with outlays of at least $20 billion during the year preceding the year in which this bill is enacted, and for which the amount of dedicated federal funds and federal trust fund balances will be inadequate to meet the total amount of outlays of the program that would otherwise be made. Each rescue committee may develop recommendations and legislation to improve the program for which it was established, including by (1) increasing the duration of positive balances of the federal trust fund established for the program, and (2) providing for the solvency of the federal trust fund established for the program during a 75-year period. Congress must use specified expedited legislative procedures to consider legislation that is approved and submitted by the rescue committees.
Title
TRUST Act of 2020 Time to Rescue United States Trusts Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4507) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4907 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2733 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2733 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Government trust funds
Legislative rules and procedure
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Government trust funds
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4323/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4323/BILLS-116s4323is.pdf |