US SB432 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to carry out a pilot program to award grants for the electrification of certain refrigerated vehicles, and for other purposes.
Title
Fostering and Realizing Electrification by Encouraging Zero Emission Refrigeration Trucks Act of 2021 FREEZER Trucks Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1335 (Related) 2021-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/432/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s432/BILLS-117s432is.pdf |