US SB4277 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require public institutions of higher education to disseminate information on the rights of, and accommodations and resources for, pregnant students, and for other purposes.
Title
Pregnant Students’ Rights Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7294 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4277/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4277/BILLS-117s4277is.pdf |