US SB4227 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to streamline the oil and gas permitting process and to recognize fee ownership for certain oil and gas drilling or spacing units, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to streamline the oil and gas permitting process and to recognize fee ownership for certain oil and gas drilling or spacing units, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554. |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with amendments. With written report No. 117-203. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |