US SB4224 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to report to Congress an analysis of border security technology along the Southwest border. The report shall address the technology DHS needs to (1) prevent terrorists from entering the United States, (2) reduce cross-border criminal activity such as drug smuggling, and (3) facilitate legal trade flow. The report shall also address recent technological advancements and assess whether such advancements can help achieve these goals. DHS shall submit the report within a year of this bill's enactment and provide annual updates for five more years.
Title
Southwest Border Security Technology Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-322. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7944 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Human trafficking
Immigration
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Latin America
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Performance measurement
Right of privacy
Smuggling and trafficking
Technology assessment
Terrorism
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Human trafficking
Immigration
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Latin America
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Performance measurement
Right of privacy
Smuggling and trafficking
Technology assessment
Terrorism