US SB422 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-10. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Senators and Senate committees, leadership offices, and other offices to share employees, and it establishes certain rules to govern this procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Shared Employee Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-10. (TXT | PDF)
2021-04-23SenateSigned by President.
2021-04-22SenatePresented to President.
2021-04-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-04-16HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1873-1874)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1873-1874)
2021-04-16HouseMs. Scanlon asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2021-03-01HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-03-01HouseReceived in the House.
2021-03-01SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S868-869; text: CR S868-869)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback