US SB4216 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004, and for other purposes.
Title
North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7078-7079) |
2022-12-08 | Senate | S.Amdt.6511 Amendment SA 6511 proposed by Senator Cardin for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S7087; text: CR S7078-7079) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-08 | Senate | S.Amdt.6511 Amendment SA 6511 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-08 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7087) |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7085-7087) |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7332 (Related) 2022-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.