US SB4205 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to establish a working group relating to best practices and Federal guidance for animals in emergencies and disasters, and for other purposes.
Title
PAW Act Planning for Animal Wellness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-212. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-14 | House | Pursuant to section 11 of H. Res. 1339, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1468, as amended; H.R. 5865; H.R. 5916, as amended; H.R. 7735, as amended; H.R. 7846; H.R. 7939, as amended; H.R. 8260, as amended; and S. 4205. (consideration: CR H7814-7822; text: CR H7814) |
2022-09-14 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1339, proceedings on S. 4205 are considered vacated. |
2022-09-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4205. |
2022-09-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7758-7759; text: CR H7758-7759) |
2022-09-13 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-08-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-08-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-08-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4165) |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 466. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-140. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7789 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 442.
HR1339 (Related) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1339 (Related) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.