US SB420 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the National Labor Relations Act, the Labor Management Relations Act, 1947, and the Labor-Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting the Right to Organize Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB842 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/420/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s420/BILLS-117s420is.pdf |