US SB4132 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 51. Record Vote Number: 170. (CR S2439)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 51. Record Vote Number: 170. (CR S2439)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect a person's ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider's ability to provide abortion services.
Title
Women’s Health Protection Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 51. Record Vote Number: 170. (CR S2439) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S2372) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S2372) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 362. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3755 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 48. Record Vote Number: 65. (CR S826)
SB1975 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8296 (Related) 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
HR1224 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1975 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8296 (Related) 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
HR1224 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.