US SB4104 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands and otherwise modifies the sharing of death data, particularly with regard to the recovery of improper payments to deceased individuals. The bill requires the Social Security Administration (SSA) to pay to states their reasonable costs for compiling and sharing records of deaths with the SSA. Under current law, the SSA is not required to pay the states but may choose to do so. In addition, the SSA may share, if certain conditions are met, the death data with federal and state agencies for a broader range of purposes. Such purposes include ensuring proper payments of benefits and tax administration duties. This authority terminates after five years. The Office of Management and Budget shall develop guidance for federal agencies that collect death data, and the Department of the Treasury and the Department of Health and Human Services shall jointly develop a plan to assist and states, local agencies, and Indian tribes in providing the data. Additionally, the SSA must share, within 30 days, death data with Treasury to facilitate the recovery of certain stimulus payments made to individuals who were deceased before January 1, 2020.
Title
Stopping Improper Payments to Deceased People Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3999-4001; text: CR S3999-4001) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2543 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1333 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
SB1333 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Income tax credits
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Income tax credits
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers