US SB4096 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to extend the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes. This bill extends the Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program through July 27, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to extend the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6160 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
SB3506 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback