US SB4086 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the definition of Vietnam era for purposes of the laws administered by the Department of Veterans Affairs. Specifically, the bill adjusts the start date of the era to November 1, 1955 (currently February 28, 1961), when relating to veterans who served in the Republic of Vietnam.
Title
Forgotten Vietnam Veterans Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6082 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4086/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4086/BILLS-116s4086is.pdf |