US SB4061 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to modify the definition of water heater under energy conservation standards, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to modify the definition of water heater under energy conservation standards, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2975 (Related) 2021-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB7962 (Same As) 2022-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB7962 (Same As) 2022-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/4061/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s4061/BILLS-117s4061is.pdf |