US SB3997 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to strengthen the security and integrity of the United States scientific and research enterprise.
Title
Safeguarding American Innovation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 620. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-317. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3104) |
Same As/Similar To
SB4324 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Department of Education
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Immigration status and procedures
Intellectual property
International exchange and broadcasting
International scientific cooperation
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Scientific communication
Subversive activities
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Visas and passports
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Department of Education
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Immigration status and procedures
Intellectual property
International exchange and broadcasting
International scientific cooperation
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Scientific communication
Subversive activities
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Visas and passports