US SB398 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Saudi Arabia Accountability and Yemen Act of 2019 This bill suspends certain weapons transfers to Saudi Arabia. It also imposes sanctions on individuals for various activities related to the civil war in Yemen and for involvement in the death of Saudi Arabian journalist Jamal Khashoggi. The United States may not authorize transfers to Saudi Arabia of missiles, ammunition, ground vehicles, aircraft, or other weapons that fall within Categories III, IV, VII, or VIII of the U.S. Munitions List. The prohibitions do not apply to ground-based missile defense systems and shall expire September 30, 2020. The United States may not provide in-flight refueling for Saudi coalition aircraft involved in the civil war. (A Saudi-led coalition has been fighting against Ansar Allah, a group in armed conflict with the government of Yemen.) The United States shall impose sanctions on individuals who are blocking the flow of humanitarian goods and services into Yemen or working to undermine the country's stability. This includes sanctions on supporters of Ansar Allah if the United States determines the group has not made meaningful efforts towards peace. The bill also imposes sanctions on foreign individuals, including any members of the Saudi royal family, who are responsible for or who aided in Khashoggi's death. The President shall impose import restrictions on cultural property unlawfully removed from Yemen on or after March 15, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Saudi Arabia Accountability and Yemen Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167.
2019-07-30SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report.
2019-07-25SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-02-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Archaeology and anthropology
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Electric power generation and transmission
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign property
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Historical and cultural resources
Human rights
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Navigation, waterways, harbors
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Arab Emirates
United Nations
Violent crime
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Water use and supply
Women's rights
Yemen

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback