US SB3973 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2010 - Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to reauthorize and extend funding for FY2012-FY2016 a grant program for reducing diesel emissions. Authorizes the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to: (1) provide contracts and rebates to eligible entities to achieve significant reductions in diesel emissions; and (2) support rebate programs administered by states that are designed to achieve such reductions. Includes among entities eligible to receive funding for reducing diesel emissions: (1) an entity that has the capacity to sell diesel vehicles or equipment to, and arrange financing for, individuals or entities that own or operate diesel fleets or to upgrade diesel vehicles or equipment with verified or EPA-certified engines or technologies; and (2) any private individual or entity that is the owner of record of a diesel vehicle or fleet and that acts pursuant to a contract, license, or lease with a federal, regional, state, local, or tribal agency or port authority with jurisdiction over transportation or air quality and in accordance with requirements for notice and approval as the Administrator of the EPA establish for the use of vehicles to be purchased or retrofitted using a grant, rebate, or loan under such Act. Includes Puerto Rico within the meaning of "state" under such Act. Revises provisions concerning the distribution and use of, and applications for, funds. Requires the Administrator to develop a simplified application process for applicants to expedite the provision of funds. Requires the Administrator and each state to publish on its website a description of each application for which a grant or loan is provided.
Title
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Roland Burris [D-IL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] |
Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Jim Webb [D-VA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-20 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 718. | |
2010-12-20 | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report. | |
2010-11-30 | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-11-18 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5809 (Related) 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-364.
HB6482 (Related) 2010-12-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6482 (Related) 2010-12-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Air quality
Environmental protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
State and local government operations
Environmental protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
State and local government operations