US SB393 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new statutory requirement for the Judicial Conference of the United States (Judicial Conference) to issue a judicial code of conduct for judges and justices of U.S. courts (including Justices of the Supreme Court). Currently, the Judicial Conference issues a code of conduct for judges of U.S. courts (but not for Justices of the Supreme Court).
Title
Supreme Court Ethics Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1057 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1057 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Federal appellate courts
Federal district courts
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Judges
Law
Supreme Court
Federal district courts
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Judges
Law
Supreme Court
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/393/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s393/BILLS-116s393is.pdf |