US SB3922 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Regulatory Repeal Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Regulatory Repeal Act of 2020

Sponsors

Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6691 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2859 (Related) 2019-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB1620 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback