US SB3905 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - By Senator Rubio from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-233. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17SenateBy Senator Rubio from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-233. Minority views filed.
2020-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477.
2020-06-08SenateSelect Committee on Intelligence. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Rubio. Without written report.

Same As/Similar To

SB838 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Australia
Budget process
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Chemical and biological weapons
Child care and development
China
Civil actions and liability
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Director of National Intelligence
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Education programs funding
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Europe
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
First Amendment rights
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Iran
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Militias and paramilitary groups
Minority education
Minority employment
National Security Agency
New Zealand
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Personnel records
Political parties and affiliation
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Russia
Sanctions
Science and engineering education
Spacecraft and satellites
Student aid and college costs
Subversive activities
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
United Kingdom
United Nations
Women's education
World health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback